EP4317059 - SOLID ELECTROLYTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co., Ltd. 1-11-1, Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8584 / JP | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAYAMA, Yuki Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Tsukasa Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0021 / JP | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22780682.5 | 28.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022JP14816 | Priority number, date | JP20210059501 | 31.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021059501 | [2024/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022210471 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4317059 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C01B25/14, H01M4/62, H01B1/06, H01M6/18, H01M10/0562 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
H01B1/06 (EP);
H01M10/0562 (EP,KR,US);
C01B17/22 (EP);
C01B25/14 (EP,KR);
H01B1/10 (EP,KR);
H01M10/052 (KR,US);
H01M4/13 (KR);
H01M4/62 (EP,KR);
H01M6/18 (EP,KR);
H01M6/187 (US);
H01M2300/0068 (KR);
H01M2300/008 (US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | FESTELEKTROLYT | [2024/06] | English: | SOLID ELECTROLYTE | [2024/06] | French: | ÉLECTROLYTE SOLIDE | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2023 | Translation filed | 11.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AX]WO2015001818 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP]) [A] 2-5, 8[X] 1, 6-7, 9-11; | [AX]JP2015220015 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 2-3, 5, 7 [X] 1, 4, 6, 8-11 | by applicant | US2016156064 | WO2020095937 | - KATO, Y. et al., "High-power all-solid-state batteries using sulfide superionic conductor.", Nat. Ener., (20160000), vol. 1, doi:10.1038/nenergy.2016.30, page 1630, XP055615412 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nenergy.2016.30 |