EP4276210 - NON-ORIENTED ELECTRICAL STEEL SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUCHI, Minako Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 02 /
NATORI, Yoshiaki Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 03 /
MURAKAWA, Tesshu Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 22781217.9 | 31.03.2022 | [2023/46] | WO2022JP16445 | Priority number, date | JP20210063523 | 02.04.2021 Original published format: JP 2021063523 | [2023/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022211007 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4276210 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C21D8/12, C22C38/60, H01F1/147, C21D7/06 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
C21D9/46 (EP);
C22C38/02 (EP,KR,US);
C21D1/26 (EP);
C21D6/008 (EP);
C21D8/1233 (EP);
C21D8/1238 (EP);
C21D8/1272 (EP);
C22C38/001 (KR);
C22C38/002 (EP);
C22C38/004 (EP,US);
C22C38/008 (KR);
C22C38/04 (EP,KR);
C22C38/06 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/08 (EP,KR);
C22C38/10 (EP,KR);
C22C38/16 (EP,KR);
C22C38/60 (EP);
H01F1/147 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Title | German: | NICHTORIENTIERTES ELEKTROSTAHLBLECH | [2023/46] | English: | NON-ORIENTED ELECTRICAL STEEL SHEET | [2023/46] | French: | TÔLE D'ACIER ÉLECTRIQUE NON ORIENTÉE | [2023/46] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2023 | Translation filed | 12.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2006219692 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]JP2011162821 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]WO2013080891 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]); | [A]JP2017193731 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP); | [A]JP2020076138 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [PA]WO2021205880 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JP4218077B | JP2011111658 | JP5256916B | JP2017145462 | JP2017193731 | JP2019178380 | JP2019183185 | JP2021063523 |