EP4318584 - UNIT PIXEL FOR LED DISPLAY AND DISPLAY DEVICE HAVING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd. 65-16, Sandan-ro 163 beon-gil Danwon-gu Ansan-si, Gyeonggi-do 15429 / KR | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANG, Jong Min Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 15429 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Sung Hyun Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 15429 / KR | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstraße 31 80801 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22781679.0 | 01.04.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022KR04677 | Priority number, date | US202163169512P | 01.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163169512 P | US202217709413 | 31.03.2022 Original published format: US202217709413 | [2024/06] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022211560 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4318584 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/075, H01L33/08, H01L33/44, H01L27/12, H01L33/38 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
H01L27/15 (EP,US);
H01L25/0753 (EP);
H01L33/005 (US);
H01L33/38 (EP,US);
H01L33/44 (US);
H01L25/167 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | EINHEITSPIXEL FÜR LED-ANZEIGE UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2024/06] | English: | UNIT PIXEL FOR LED DISPLAY AND DISPLAY DEVICE HAVING SAME | [2024/06] | French: | PIXEL UNITAIRE POUR AFFICHAGE À DEL ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE LE COMPORTANT | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2023 | Translation filed | 31.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP4636501B (OKI DATA CORP. et al.) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0026]-[0056]; and figures 1-2. *; | [A]KR20190074066 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0022]-[0043]; and figure 1. *; | [A]KR102016260B (KOREA PHOTONICS TECH INST [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0042]-[0047]; and figures 6a-6e. *; | [XYA]KR20200096529 (SEOUL VIOSYS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,13-18 * See paragraphs [0082]-[0102] and [0177]-[0218]; and figures 2 and 10-12. * [Y] 11-12 [A] 4-10,19-20; | [Y]WO2020231108 (SEOUL VIOSYS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 11-12 * See paragraphs [0055]-[0082]; and figures 1A-1E. * |