EP4313989 - HPK1 ANTAGONISTS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nimbus Saturn, Inc. 22 Boston Wharf Road, 9th Floor Boston, MA 02210 / US | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAILA, Neelu Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | 02 /
LINNEY, Ian Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | 03 /
WARD, Stuart Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | 04 /
WISHART, Grant Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | 05 /
WHITTAKER, Benjamin Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | 06 /
COTE, Alexandre New York, New Jersey 07093 / US | 07 /
GREENWOOD, Jeremy, Robert Brooklyn, New York 11238 / US | 08 /
LEFFLER, Abba Bronx, New York 10463 / US | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Tostmann, Holger Carl Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22782400.0 | 29.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022US71403 | Priority number, date | US202163167455P | 29.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163167455 P | US202163182313P | 30.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163182313 P | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022213062 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4313989 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07D471/04, A61K31/437 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP);
C07D519/00 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | HPK1-ANTAGONISTEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2024/06] | English: | HPK1 ANTAGONISTS AND USES THEREOF | [2024/06] | French: | ANTAGONISTES DE HPK1 ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 05.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2018127396 (LI LIANSHENG [US], et al); | [Y]US2018141951 (ARIKAWA YASUYOSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2021078997 (KAILA NEELU [US], et al) |