EP4315397 - FIELD-PROGRAMMABLE FERRO-DIODES FOR RECONFIGURABLE IN-MEMORY-COMPUTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania 3600 Civic Center Boulevard, 9th Floor Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JARIWALA, Deep Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19130 / US | 02 /
OLSSON III, Roy H. Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19130 / US | 03 /
STACH, Eric Andrew Swarthmore, Pennsylvania 19081 / US | 04 /
LIU, Xiwen Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19104 / US | 05 /
WANG, Dixiong Milpitas, California, 95035 / US | 06 /
ZHENG, Jeffrey Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19104 / US | 07 /
FIAGBENU, Merrilyn Mercy Adzo Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19139 / US | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Abthorpe, Mark, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22782415.8 | 30.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022US71440 | Priority number, date | US202163167765P | 30.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163167765 P | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022213087 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4315397 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/02, H01L21/28, H01L29/24, H01L29/45, H01L29/51, H01L29/66 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
G11C13/0002 (EP,KR);
H10B69/00 (EP,KR,US);
G11C11/2275 (US);
G11C11/22 (EP,KR);
G11C11/54 (EP,KR);
G11C15/046 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02178 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02192 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02194 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02266 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02425 (EP,KR);
H01L21/0254 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02579 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02581 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02631 (EP,KR);
H01L29/24 (EP);
H01L29/861 (US);
H01L29/8615 (EP,KR);
H10B63/80 (EP);
H10N70/026 (EP);
H10N70/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | FELDPROGRAMMIERBARE FERRODIODEN FÜR REKONFIGURIERBARE SPEICHERINTERNE BERECHNUNG | [2024/06] | English: | FIELD-PROGRAMMABLE FERRO-DIODES FOR RECONFIGURABLE IN-MEMORY-COMPUTING | [2024/06] | French: | FERRO-DIODES PROGRAMMABLES PAR L'UTILISATEUR POUR INFORMATIQUE EN MÉMOIRE RECONFIGURABLE | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 08.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2016225775 (PARK JI HOON [SA], et al); | [Y]US2020357821 (CHEN YUNG-TIN [US]); | [Y]US2020394506 (LOUIZOS CHRISTOS [NL], et al); | [Y]US2021026601 (KOBAYASHI TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al); |