EP4208877 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MONITORING AT LEAST ONE MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, PT, SK | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aesculap AG Am Aesculap-Platz 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LENZENHUBER, Frederick 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | 02 /
HÖGERLE, Roland-Alois 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 22783335.7 | 19.09.2022 | [2023/28] | WO2022EP75973 | Priority number, date | DE202110124194 | 20.09.2021 Original published format: DE102021124194 | [2023/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023041785 | Date: | 23.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4208877 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4208877 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G16H40/20, G16H40/63, A61B90/98, A61B34/20 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
G16H40/20 (EP);
A61B90/98 (EP);
G16H40/63 (EP);
A61B2034/2051 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG ZUMINDEST EINES MEDIZINPRODUKTS | [2023/28] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MONITORING AT LEAST ONE MEDICAL DEVICE | [2023/28] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE D'AU MOINS UN DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL | [2023/28] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 06.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 13.12.2023 | EE | 13.12.2023 | HR | 13.12.2023 | LT | 13.12.2023 | LV | 13.12.2023 | PL | 13.12.2023 | RO | 13.12.2023 | RS | 13.12.2023 | SE | 13.12.2023 | SK | 13.12.2023 | SM | 13.12.2023 | BG | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.03.2024 | GR | 14.03.2024 | IS | 13.04.2024 | PT | 15.04.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 13.12.2023 | |
EE | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
RO | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 13.12.2023 | |
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 14.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2019151044 (BLACK PATRICIA [US]); | [A]US2020043603 (HANAJIMA MASAKI [JP]); | [A]EP3207491 (SPA TRACK MEDICAL LTD [GB]) | by applicant | US10709521 |