EP4144879 - TUNGSTEN MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A.L.M.T. Corp. 8-21-1, Ginza Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | [2023/39] |
Former [2023/10] | For all designated states A.L.M.T. Corp. 11-11 Shiba 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0014 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IIKURA, Takeshi Sakata-shi, Yamagata 998-0064 / JP | 02 /
KADOKURA, Takanori Toyama-shi, Toyama 931-8543 / JP | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 22784536.9 | 25.03.2022 | [2023/10] | WO2022JP14433 | Priority number, date | JP20210064811 | 06.04.2021 Original published format: JP 2021064811 | [2023/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022215551 | Date: | 13.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4144879 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.10.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C22C27/04, C22C1/04, C22F1/00, C22F1/18, B22F3/10, B22F1/00 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
C22C1/045 (EP,US);
C22C27/04 (EP,KR,US);
C22F1/18 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/05 (KR,US);
B22F1/145 (US);
B22F3/10 (KR,US);
C22C1/04 (KR);
B22F2998/10 (EP);
B22F2999/00 (EP);
Y02E30/10 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, C22C1/1084, B22F3/02, B22F3/1007, B22F2003/175, B22F2003/185, B22F2003/247 (EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F3/1007, B22F2201/013 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | WOLFRAMMATERIAL | [2023/10] | English: | TUNGSTEN MATERIAL | [2023/10] | French: | MATÉRIAU DE TUNGSTÈNE | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2022 | Translation filed | 28.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 29.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102015218408 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | International search | [A]JPS58133356 (TOKYO TUNGSTEN KK); | [A]JPH029786 (NAT RES INST METALS, et al); | [A]JPH06116077 (TOKYO TUNGSTEN KK); | [A]WO2005073418 (NIPPON TUNGSTEN [JP], et al); | [A]WO2012097393 (PLANSEE SE [AT], et al); | [A]CN102796977 (ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY & MAT CO); | [A]CN111136264 (XI'AN REFRA TUNGSTEN & MOLYBDENUM CO LTD) | by applicant | JPS62146235 | JP2021064811 |