EP4321637 - SURFACE-TREATED STEEL SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAMOTO, Kosuke Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 02 /
GOTO, Yasuto Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 03 /
OKA, Masaharu Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 04 /
DAIROKUNO, Yuta Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 05 /
KAJII, Yuji Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 06 /
SHIMADA, Koki Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2024/07] | Application number, filing date | 22784626.8 | 31.03.2022 | [2024/07] | WO2022JP16465 | Priority number, date | JP20210066776 | 09.04.2021 Original published format: JP 2021066776 | [2024/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022215642 | Date: | 13.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4321637 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.10.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/06, C21D1/18, C21D8/02, C21D9/46, C21D1/26, C22C38/12, H01M50/124, C25D7/06, C25D5/12, C25D5/50, C22C38/00, C22C38/04, C22C38/14, C23C18/32, H01M50/119, B32B15/01, // C23C18/16, C25D3/12, C25D5/36, H01M50/107 | [2024/40] | CPC: |
C21D9/46 (EP,KR);
C21D8/0247 (KR);
C22C38/04 (EP,KR,US);
B32B15/013 (EP);
C21D1/185 (EP);
C21D1/26 (EP);
C21D8/0205 (EP);
C21D8/0257 (EP);
C21D8/0278 (EP,KR);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (KR);
C22C38/06 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/12 (EP,KR);
C22C38/14 (EP,KR);
C23C18/32 (EP,KR);
C23C28/023 (KR);
C25D3/12 (EP,KR,US);
C25D5/12 (EP,KR,US);
C25D5/50 (EP,KR,US);
C25D7/0614 (EP);
H01M50/119 (EP,KR);
H01M50/1245 (EP);
C21D2211/002 (EP,KR);
C21D2211/003 (EP,KR);
C21D2211/005 (EP,KR);
C21D2211/009 (EP);
C23C18/1653 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2024/07] | C21D9/46, C25D5/12, C25D5/50, C22C38/00, C22C38/14, C23C18/32, H01M50/119 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDELTES STAHLBLECH | [2024/07] | English: | SURFACE-TREATED STEEL SHEET | [2024/07] | French: | TÔLE D'ACIER TRAITÉE EN SURFACE | [2024/07] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2023 | Translation filed | 27.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2019198819 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2020009213 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2020222305 (TOYO KOHAN CO LTD [JP]); | [A]JP2021509435 ; | [PA]WO2021100211 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]); | [PA]WO2021177231 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) | by applicant | WO2012147843 | WO2019083044 | WO2019159794 |