EP4322330 - WIRING BOARD AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING WIRING BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | 14.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IIMURA Keita Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 02 /
KAWAGUCHI Shuji Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 03 /
KINOSHITA Kazuki Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 04 /
IIOKA Hidetoshi Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 05 /
TAKE Seiji Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2024/07] | Application number, filing date | 22784665.6 | 04.04.2022 | [2024/07] | WO2022JP17051 | Priority number, date | JP20210066761 | 09.04.2021 Original published format: JP 2021066761 | [2024/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022215683 | Date: | 13.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4322330 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/38, H05K1/02 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
H01Q1/38 (EP,KR);
H05K3/4602 (US);
H05K1/0213 (KR);
H05K1/0274 (EP);
H05K1/0298 (US);
H05K1/165 (EP);
H05K3/4652 (US);
H05K2201/0108 (EP);
H05K2201/09681 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] | Title | German: | LEITERPLATTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER LEITERPLATTE | [2024/07] | English: | WIRING BOARD AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING WIRING BOARD | [2024/07] | French: | CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELLE-CI | [2024/07] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2023 | Translation filed | 02.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/07] | 15.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YX]JP2018060345 (JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRONICS IND LTD); | [Y]JP2020036031 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [YX]KR20210034577 (DONGWOO FINE CHEM CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | JP2011066610 | JP5636735B | JP5695947B |