EP4321643 - ZN-AL-MG PLATED CHECKERED STEEL PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAITO, Mamoru Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 02 /
GOTO, Yasuto Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2024/07] | Application number, filing date | 22784676.3 | 05.04.2022 | [2024/07] | WO2022JP17109 | Priority number, date | JP20210064721 | 06.04.2021 Original published format: JP 2021064721 | [2024/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022215694 | Date: | 13.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4321643 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C22C18/00, C22C18/04, C23C2/02, C23C2/06, C23C2/28 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
C23C30/00 (EP);
C22C18/04 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/06 (KR,US);
C21D8/0226 (US);
C21D9/46 (US);
C22C18/00 (EP);
C23C2/02 (KR);
C23C2/026 (EP);
C23C2/261 (US);
C23C2/28 (EP,KR);
C23C2/40 (US);
C23C28/023 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] | Title | German: | MIT ZN-AL-MG PLATTIERTE KONTROLLSTAHLPLATTE | [2024/07] | English: | ZN-AL-MG PLATED CHECKERED STEEL PLATE | [2024/07] | French: | PLAQUE D'ACIER À DAMIER PLAQUÉE DE ZN-AL-MG | [2024/07] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2023 | Translation filed | 06.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH11279732 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD); | [A]JP2005273019 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD); | [A]JP2018053288 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP); | [A]WO2019054483 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JP2743774B | WO2019054483 | JP2021064721 |