EP4131123 - SECONDARY BATTERY MANAGEMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3DOM ALLIANCE INC. 1-7-1 Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | For all designated states TESNOLOGY Inc. 1-7-1 Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMURA, Akihiko Tokyo 1070052 / JP | 02 /
KONDO, Katsuhiko Tokyo 1070052 / JP | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Schröer, Gernot H. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 22785679.6 | 08.06.2022 | [2023/06] | WO2022JP23123 | Priority number, date | JP20210101757 | 18.06.2021 Original published format: JP 2021101757 | [2023/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022264898 | Date: | 22.12.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4131123 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.12.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/06, G06Q40/06, B60L58/10, G06Q30/02 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
G06Q20/145 (EP,KR);
G06Q40/06 (KR);
B60L53/665 (EP);
B60L53/68 (EP);
B60L58/12 (KR);
B60L58/16 (KR);
G06Q10/08 (KR);
G06Q30/0283 (EP,KR);
G06Q30/0645 (EP,KR);
G06Q40/04 (EP,KR);
G06Q50/26 (KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | G06Q30/06, G06Q40/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | SEKUNDÄRBATTERIEVERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/06] | English: | SECONDARY BATTERY MANAGEMENT DEVICE | [2023/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GESTION DE BATTERIE SECONDAIRE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2022 | Translation filed | 17.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 15.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2020009121 (NISHINA HIROAKI); | [I]US2020250693 (KANAMORI IORI [JP], et al); | [A]US2020326382 (MATSUMURA AKIHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]US2020326381 (MATSUMURA AKIHIKO [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JP2005346687 (WATANABE MAIKU); | [A]WO2019031423 (HIGA ISAO [JP]); | [YX]JP2020126305 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JP2020149679 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]WO2021064818 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]JP2021086191 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) | by applicant | WO2019131824 | JP2020126305 |