EP4384492 - CYCLOOCTENE-BENZOPHENONE MONOMER, AS WELL AS CATIONIC POLYMER, CROSS-LINKED POLYELECTROLYTE, COMPOSITE MATERIAL, MEMBRANE, ELECTRODE AND ELECTROCHEMICAL DEVICE, E.G. ELECTROLYZER, PREPARED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECOLECTRO, INC. 61 Brown Rd., Suite 103 Ithaca, New York 14850 / US | [2024/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUGAR, Kristina Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | 02 /
SELHORST, Ryan Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | 03 /
POOLE, Sarah, Louise Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | 04 /
SIMONEAU, Christopher Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | [2024/25] | Representative(s) | Snodin, Michael D. Park Grove IP MediCity Nottingham D6 Building, Thane Road Nottingham NG90 6BH / GB | [2024/25] | Application number, filing date | 22786142.4 | 10.08.2022 | [2024/25] | WO2022US39908 | Priority number, date | US202163231491P | 10.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163231491 P | [2024/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023018765 | Date: | 16.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4384492 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07C49/786, C07C49/794, C07C49/84, C07C43/205, C08F230/02, C08F30/02, C08F8/40, C08G61/06, C08G61/08, C08G79/02, C08L85/02, H01M4/86, H01M8/02, H01M8/10 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
C07C49/84 (EP,KR);
C07F9/062 (EP,KR);
C08G61/08 (EP,KR);
C08L65/00 (EP,KR);
C25B13/02 (EP,KR);
C25B13/07 (EP,KR);
C25B13/08 (EP,KR);
H01M8/1004 (KR);
H01M8/188 (EP,KR);
C07C2601/18 (EP,KR);
C08F2810/20 (EP);
C08G2261/1424 (EP,KR);
C08G2261/1426 (EP,KR);
C08G2261/143 (EP,KR);
C08G2261/148 (EP,KR);
C08G2261/3322 (EP,KR);
C08G2261/418 (EP,KR);
C25B1/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CYCLOOCTEN-BENZOPHENON-MONOMER SOWIE DARAUS HERGESTELLTES KATIONISCHES POLYMER, VERNETZTER POLYELEKTROLYT, VERBUNDSTOFF, MEMBRAN, ELEKTRODE UND ELEKTROCHEMISCHE VORRICHTUNG, Z.B. ELEKTROLYSEUR | [2024/25] | English: | CYCLOOCTENE-BENZOPHENONE MONOMER, AS WELL AS CATIONIC POLYMER, CROSS-LINKED POLYELECTROLYTE, COMPOSITE MATERIAL, MEMBRANE, ELECTRODE AND ELECTROCHEMICAL DEVICE, E.G. ELECTROLYZER, PREPARED THEREFROM | [2024/25] | French: | MONOMÈRE DE CYCLOOCTÈNE-BENZOPHÉNONE, POLYMÈRE CATIONIQUE, POLYÉLECTROLYTE RÉTICULÉ, MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE, MEMBRANE, ÉLECTRODE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE, PAR EX, ÉLECTROLYSEUR PRÉPARÉ À BASE DE CEUX-CI | [2024/25] | Entry into regional phase | 29.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 29.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | 29.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]CH475242 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | [A]WO2012078513 (UNIV CORNELL [US], et al); |