EP4384572 - FLAME RETARDANT POLYMERIC COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2211 H.H. Dow Way Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2024/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEVEN, Karl M. Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | 02 /
WILLIAMSON, Alexander Lake Jackson, Texas 77566 / US | 03 /
SABA, Stacey A. Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | 04 /
BRIGANDI, Paul J. Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | 05 /
COGEN, Jeffrey M. Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | 06 /
ESSEGHIR, Mohamed Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | [2024/25] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2024/25] | Application number, filing date | 22787111.8 | 09.08.2022 | [2024/25] | WO2022US74698 | Priority number, date | US202163232055P | 11.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163232055 P | [2024/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023019130 | Date: | 16.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4384572 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/06, C08L23/08, H01B3/44, H01B7/29 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
H01B7/295 (EP,KR);
C08L23/0815 (KR);
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
C08K3/016 (KR);
C08L23/0853 (EP,KR);
C08L23/0876 (KR);
C08L31/04 (US);
C08L51/06 (KR);
H01B3/441 (EP,KR);
C08L2201/00 (EP);
C08L2201/02 (KR);
C08L2203/202 (EP,KR);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/06, C08L51/06, C08L23/0869, C08K3/016 (EP);
C08L23/06, C08L51/06, C08L23/0876, C08K3/016 (EP);
C08L23/06, C08L51/06, C08L51/06, C08L23/0876, C08K3/016 (EP);
C08L23/0853, C08L51/06, C08L23/0876, C08K3/016 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLAMMWIDRIGE POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2024/25] | English: | FLAME RETARDANT POLYMERIC COMPOSITIONS | [2024/25] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POLYMÈRES IGNIFUGES | [2024/25] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | 16.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010069545 (GAU YIMSAN [US], et al); | [A]EP2544196 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2014151297 (GEN CABLE TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) | by applicant | US4255303 | US5034442 | US6569947 | US2008251273 | US7514489 | WO2013116283 |