EP4324348 - AEROSOL GENERATION APPARATUS AND INFRARED HEATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen First Union Technology Co., Ltd. 1-3 F, Building C Gaoxin Industry Zone Tangwei Village Fuyong Town Baoan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QI, Shen Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
XU, Zhongli Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 03 /
LI, Yonghai Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Proi World Intellectual Property GmbH Obermattweg 12 6052 Hergiswil, Kanton Nidwalden / CH | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 22787572.1 | 13.04.2022 | [2024/08] | WO2022CN86649 | Priority number, date | CN202120764313U | 15.04.2021 Original published format: CN 202120764313 U | [2024/08] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022218350 | Date: | 20.10.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4324348 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.10.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/40, A24F40/46 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
A24F40/46 (EP,US);
A24F40/51 (EP,US);
H05B3/145 (EP);
H05B3/44 (EP);
A24F40/20 (EP);
A24F40/57 (US);
H05B2203/032 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Title | German: | AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND INFRAROTHEIZER | [2024/08] | English: | AEROSOL GENERATION APPARATUS AND INFRARED HEATER | [2024/08] | French: | APPAREIL DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL ET ÉLÉMENT CHAUFFANT À INFRAROUGE | [2024/08] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2023 | Translation filed | 13.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | 03.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018007971 (PLOJOUX JULIEN [CH], et al); | [X]CN209527880U (CHINA TOBACCO ANHUI IND CO LTD); | [A]WO2020017696 (MTIG [KR], et al); | [X]WO2020165450 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]); | [X]US2020397054 (RIVA REGGIORI RICCARDO [CH], et al); | [A]CN112369713 (HUBEI CHINA TOBACCO IND CO LTD); | [A]CN112385902 (SHENZHEN FIRST UNION TECH CO); | [X]US2021084980 (LEE SEUNG WON [KR], et al) | International search | [A]CN109090708 (CHINA HEALTH AND WELLNESS GROUP LTD); | [Y]CN109674093 (CHINA TOBACCO ANHUI IND CO LTD); | [Y]CN211910548U (SHENZHEN FIRST UNION TECH CO); | [A]CN112369682 (HUBEI CHINA TOBACCO IND CO LTD); | [PX]CN215347059U (SHENZHEN FIRST UNION TECH CO) |