EP4324360 - INACTIVATION METHOD AND PRECISE CALCULATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ushio Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 1-6-5, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8150 / JP | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHASHI, Hiroyuki Tokyo 100-8150 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Shinji Tokyo 100-8150 / JP | 03 /
OWADA, Tatsushi Tokyo 100-8150 / JP | 04 /
ABE, Ryoji Tokyo 100-8150 / JP | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 22787900.4 | 08.03.2022 | [2024/08] | WO2022JP09886 | Priority number, date | JP20210067671 | 13.04.2021 Original published format: JP 2021067671 | [2024/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022219972 | Date: | 20.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4324360 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47F9/04, G07G1/00, A61L2/10 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
A47F9/04 (EP);
A61L2/10 (EP);
G06Q20/20 (EP);
G07G1/0018 (EP);
G07G1/0036 (EP);
A47F2009/041 (EP);
A61L2202/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Title | German: | INAKTIVIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND PRÄZISES BERECHNUNGSSYSTEM | [2024/08] | English: | INACTIVATION METHOD AND PRECISE CALCULATION SYSTEM | [2024/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INACTIVATION ET SYSTÈME DE CALCUL PRÉCIS | [2024/08] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2023 | Translation filed | 06.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2020289687 (RILEY KELSEY MARIE [US], et al); | [A]JP3230090U ; | [A]US10933150 (ROBINSON SCOTT DAVID [US], et al) | by applicant | JP2002080017 | JP2007110978 | JP2017528258 |