EP4324898 - ORGANIC FEEDSTOCK DECOMPOSITION METHOD, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING LIQUID FUEL, SOLID FUEL, OR ACTIVATED CARBON USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Revo International Inc. 173 Shimotoba hiroosa-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8473 / JP | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUNAGA, Kotetsu Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8473 / JP | 02 /
KOSHIKAWA, Tetsuya Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8473 / JP | 03 /
AZUMA, Yuichiro Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8473 / JP | 04 /
KOSHIKAWA, Shoi Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8473 / JP | 05 /
MOCHIDA, Isao Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8473 / JP | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 22788169.5 | 12.04.2022 | [2024/08] | WO2022JP17616 | Priority number, date | JP20210068497 | 14.04.2021 Original published format: JP 2021068497 | WO2021JP36613 | 04.10.2021 Original published format: PCT/JP2021/036613 | [2024/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022220246 | Date: | 20.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4324898 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C10B47/24, C10G1/00, C10G1/10, C10G3/00, C10B53/00, C10B53/02, C01B32/324 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
C10G1/10 (EP,KR);
C10G1/00 (KR);
C10G1/086 (KR,US);
C01B32/324 (EP,KR);
C10B47/24 (EP,KR);
C10B53/00 (EP,KR);
C10B53/02 (EP,KR);
C10B53/07 (EP);
C10G1/002 (KR);
C10G1/02 (EP);
C10G1/06 (EP);
C10G3/00 (EP);
C10G3/50 (EP);
C10G7/00 (US);
C10K1/04 (EP);
C10L5/447 (EP);
C01P2006/12 (EP);
C10G2300/1003 (KR,US);
C10G2300/1011 (EP);
C10G2300/1014 (KR,US);
C10G2300/4081 (US);
C10G2300/70 (KR);
C10G2300/80 (KR);
C10G2400/08 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZERSETZUNG VON ORGANISCHEM ROHSTOFF UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FLÜSSIGEM BRENNSTOFF, FESTEM BRENNSTOFF ODER AKTIVKOHLE DAMIT | [2024/08] | English: | ORGANIC FEEDSTOCK DECOMPOSITION METHOD, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING LIQUID FUEL, SOLID FUEL, OR ACTIVATED CARBON USING SAME | [2024/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCOMPOSITION DE CHARGE D'ALIMENTATION ORGANIQUE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE COMBUSTIBLE LIQUIDE, DE COMBUSTIBLE SOLIDE OU DE CHARBON ACTIF L'UTILISANT | [2024/08] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2023 | Translation filed | 02.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YX]JPS5443902 (KOGYO GIJUTSUIN); | [YX]JPS55135195 (EBARA MFG); | [Y]JPS5837242B ; | [YX]JPH10185113 (EBARA CORP); | [Y]JP2004339360 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]JP2005272782 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO); | [A]JP2009046644 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL); | [Y]JP4371433B ; | [Y]JP2011517470 ; | [Y]JP2018039989 (JFE STEEL CORP) | by applicant | JP2001065364 | JP2008189704 | JP2009046644 | JP2013170224 | JP2016079325 | JP2016517344 | JP2017080662 | JP2021068497 | WO2021JP36613 |