EP4325464 - INTELLIGENT HIGH-TECH SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AIRCRAFT GROUND GUIDANCE AND CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NST Co., Ltd. 1503-ho, 14 Gasan digital 2-ro, Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Byoung Kwan Osan-si Gyeonggi-do 18108 / KR | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 22788317.0 | 05.04.2022 | [2024/08] | WO2022KR04822 | Priority number, date | KR20210049131 | 15.04.2021 Original published format: KR 20210049131 | [2024/08] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022220461 | Date: | 20.10.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4325464 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G08G5/02, G08G5/04, G08G5/06 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
G08G5/0013 (EP);
G08G5/06 (US);
G08G5/0026 (EP);
G08G5/0043 (EP);
G08G5/0065 (EP);
G08G5/0082 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTES HOCHTECHNISCHES SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR FLUGZEUGBODENFÜHRUNG UND -STEUERUNG | [2024/08] | English: | INTELLIGENT HIGH-TECH SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AIRCRAFT GROUND GUIDANCE AND CONTROL | [2024/08] | French: | SYSTÈME DE HAUTE TECHNOLOGIE INTELLIGENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE GUIDAGE ET DE COMMANDE AU SOL D'AÉRONEF | [2024/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2023 | Translation filed | 15.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2007240190 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0013]-[0019] and figure 1. *; | [XYA]WO2016017883 (KOREA AIRPORTS CORP [KR]) [X] 1,5 * See paragraphs [0038]-[0057] and figures 3 and 4. * [Y] 2-4 [A] 6-12; | [A]KR20160090483 (LSIS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12 * See claims 1-10 and figure 4. *; | [A]KR101650905B (SUNJIN LIGHT CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0027]-[0052] and figures 1 and 2. *; | [Y]KR101656280B (SUNJIN LIGHT CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 2-4 * See paragraphs [0040]-[0054] and figures 1 and 2. *; | [PX]KR102315546B (CHOI BYEONG GWAN [KR]) [PX] 1-12 * See claims 1-4 and 7-12. ** This document is the published patent of a priority application (KR) of the present PCT application. * |