EP4310909 - UNIT PIXEL FOR LED DISPLAY AND DISPLAY DEVICE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd. 65-16, Sandan-ro 163 beon-gil Danwon-gu Ansan-si, Gyeonggi-do 15429 / KR | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANG, Jong Min Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 15429 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Sung Hyun Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 15429 / KR | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstraße 31 80801 München / DE | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 22788459.0 | 14.04.2022 | [2024/04] | WO2022KR05384 | Priority number, date | US202163174769P | 14.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163174769 P | US202217719323 | 12.04.2022 Original published format: US202217719323 | [2024/04] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022220604 | Date: | 20.10.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4310909 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/075, H01L33/20, H01L23/00, H01L33/38 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
H01L25/0753 (EP);
H01L25/0756 (US);
H01L24/29 (US);
H01L24/32 (US);
H01L24/33 (US);
H01L27/15 (EP);
H01L33/0093 (US);
H01L33/44 (EP,US);
H01L2224/039 (US);
H01L2224/05558 (US);
H01L2224/05573 (US);
H01L2224/06179 (US);
H01L2224/13006 (US);
H01L2224/13013 (US);
H01L2224/13023 (US);
H01L2224/13082 (US);
H01L2224/13109 (US);
H01L2224/13144 (US);
H01L2224/13147 (US);
H01L2224/14179 (US);
H01L2224/29082 (US);
H01L2224/29186 (US);
H01L2224/2919 (US);
H01L2224/32148 (US);
H01L2224/33181 (US);
H01L2224/83005 (US);
H01L2224/8393 (US);
H01L24/03 (US);
H01L24/05 (US);
H01L24/06 (US);
H01L24/13 (US);
H01L24/14 (US);
H01L2924/05442 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Title | German: | EINHEITSPIXEL FÜR LED-ANZEIGE UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2024/04] | English: | UNIT PIXEL FOR LED DISPLAY AND DISPLAY DEVICE COMPRISING SAME | [2024/04] | French: | PIXEL UNITAIRE POUR ÉCRAN À DEL ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE LE COMPORTANT | [2024/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2023 | Translation filed | 17.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]KR20120005662 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 4,5,18 * See paragraphs [0010]-[0018]; and figure 1. *; | [Y]WO2016129873 (SEOUL VIOSYS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 11 * See paragraphs [0150]-[0153]; and figure 20c. *; | [Y]KR20170118511 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 13* See paragraphs [0093]-[0108]; and figure 15. *; | [XY]KR20200090841 (SEOUL VIOSYS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,6-10,14-17,19,20 * See paragraphs [0050]-[0435] and [0705]-[0846]; and figures 1-23 and 33. * [Y] 3-5,11-13,18; | [Y]US2021104574 (BEHRINGER MARTIN [DE], et al) [Y] 3 * See paragraphs [0177]-[0268], [0556] and [0886]. *; | [Y]CN212934611U (SEOUL VIOSYS CO LTD) [Y] 12,13 * See paragraphs [0116]-[0124]; and figures 7B-8C. * |