EP4278612 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TIMED AND EVENT TRIGGERED UPDATES IN SCENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YIP, Eric Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
YANG, Hyunkoo Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
RHYU, Sungryeul Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
SONG, Jaeyeon Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22788488.9 | 15.04.2022 | [2023/47] | WO2022KR05447 | Priority number, date | KR20210049969 | 16.04.2021 Original published format: KR 20210049969 | [2023/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022220633 | Date: | 20.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4278612 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.10.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/84, H04N21/81, H04N21/8547, H04N21/44 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
H04N21/816 (EP,KR);
H04N21/84 (KR);
H04N21/8547 (KR,US);
G06T15/005 (US);
G06T19/006 (US);
H04N21/23412 (EP);
H04N21/26291 (EP);
H04N21/44012 (EP);
H04N21/8543 (EP);
H04N21/8545 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/47] | H04N21/84, H04N21/81, H04N21/8547 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR ZEITGESTEUERTE UND EREIGNISGESTEUERTE AKTUALISIERUNGEN IN EINER SZENE | [2023/47] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TIMED AND EVENT TRIGGERED UPDATES IN SCENE | [2023/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR MISES À JOUR SYNCHRONISÉES ET DÉCLENCHÉES PAR UN ÉVÉNEMENT DANS UNE SCÈNE | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2021012578 (BRIMHALL THANE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0068]-[0085]; and figure 5 *; | [A]US2021049827 (LEBAREDIAN REV [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-9 *; | [A]US2021064774 (COLLART TODD [US]) [A] 1-15* claims 1-19 *; | [Y]US2021099773 (BOUAZIZI IMED [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0068], [0143]-[0148]; and figure 8 *; | [Y]US2021105451 (OYMAN OZGUR [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0026], [0080]-[0085], [0089]; and figure 8 * |