EP4323224 - ELECTRIC VEHICLE CHARGING SYSTEM WITH A CHARGING CABLE THAT INCLUDES AN INLINE CABLE CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chargepoint, Inc. 254 East Hacienda Avenue Campbell, California 95008 / US | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHAMASHTA, Robert Mitri Campbell, California 95008 / US | 02 /
HAGENMAIER, Carl Fredrick, Jr. Los Altos, California 94022 / US | 03 /
HARDIN, Charles San Jose, California 95125 / US | 04 /
HOWARD, Joseph Orlando, Florida 32801 / US | 05 /
MATSUNO, Craig Toshiro San Jose, California 95117 / US | 06 /
SIDLE, Stephen Eric Morgan Hill, California 95037 / US | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 22788964.9 | 14.04.2022 | [2024/08] | WO2022US24898 | Priority number, date | US202117230809 | 14.04.2021 Original published format: US202117230809 | [2024/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022221583 | Date: | 20.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4323224 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60L53/18, B60L53/16, H04B3/54, H04L12/40 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
B60L53/18 (EP,US);
B60L53/305 (EP,US);
B60L53/62 (US);
B60L53/66 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Title | German: | ELEKTROFAHRZEUGLADESYSTEM MIT EINEM LADEKABEL MIT EINER INLINE-KABELSTEUERUNG | [2024/08] | English: | ELECTRIC VEHICLE CHARGING SYSTEM WITH A CHARGING CABLE THAT INCLUDES AN INLINE CABLE CONTROLLER | [2024/08] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CHARGE DE VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE AVEC UN CÂBLE DE CHARGE COMPRENANT UN CONTRÔLUR DE CÂBLE EN LIGNE | [2024/08] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | 24.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013094552 (VEDANTHAM RAMANUJA [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * Paragraphs [0024]-[0030]; claim 1; and figure 1 *; | [XY]US2013219084 (WU DONGXIAO [CN], et al) [X] 1-3,7-10,26,30,32 * Paragraphs [0078], [0107]-[0114], [0123]-[0129]; claims 1-2, 5; and figures 4-5 * [Y] 4-6,11-25,27-29,31,33; | [A]US2014015482 (NITZBERG JASON-DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-33* Paragraphs [0038]-[0048]; claim 1; and figure 5 *; | [A]US2016347191 (HAYASHIGAWA LARRY [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * Paragraphs [0046]-[0059]; claim 1; and figure 1 *; | [Y]US2020198478 (SHIN KWANG SEOB [KR], et al) [Y] 4-6,11-25,27-29,31,33 * Paragraphs [0051], [0066], [0078]; claims 3, 14, 17; and figures 7-9 * |