EP4152462 - FLAT-PLATE SODIUM METAL BATTERY AND ELECTROCHEMICAL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology (Hong Kong) Limited Level 19, China Building 29 Queen's Road Central Central, Central And Western District / HK | [2024/40] |
Former [2023/12] | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No.2 Xingang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENG, Yuqun Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Ziebig Hengelhaupt Intellectual Property Attorneys Patentanwaltskanzlei PartGmbB Leipziger Straße 49 10117 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/12] | Ziebig Hengelhaupt Intellectual Property Attorneys Patentanwaltsanwaltskanzlei PartGmbB Leipziger Straße 49 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 22793376.9 | 25.02.2022 | [2023/12] | WO2022CN77901 | Priority number, date | CN202110742606 | 26.06.2021 Original published format: CN202110742606 | [2023/12] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022267510 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4152462 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.12.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/054, H01M10/04, H01M4/485, H01M10/0585, H01M50/417, H01M4/66, H01M4/58, H01M4/74, // H01M4/02 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
H01M10/054 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/04 (CN);
H01M10/045 (CN);
H01M10/0585 (EP);
H01M4/0404 (CN);
H01M4/485 (EP);
H01M4/5825 (EP,US);
H01M4/583 (US);
H01M4/622 (US);
H01M4/663 (EP);
H01M4/667 (EP);
H01M4/742 (EP);
H01M4/80 (US);
H01M50/242 (CN);
H01M50/249 (CN);
H01M50/414 (US);
H01M50/417 (EP);
H01M2004/021 (EP,CN,US);
H01M2004/027 (EP,CN,US);
H01M2004/028 (EP,CN,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/12] | H01M10/054, H01M10/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | FLACHPLATTEN-NATRIUMMETALLBATTERIE UND ELEKTROCHEMISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/12] | English: | FLAT-PLATE SODIUM METAL BATTERY AND ELECTROCHEMICAL APPARATUS | [2023/12] | French: | BATTERIE AU MÉTAL-SODIUM À PLAQUE PLATE ET APPAREIL ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2022 | Translation filed | 11.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 07.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017309918 (ROUMI FARSHID [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,10 * figure 4A * * paragraphs [0007] , [0 50] , [0 90] , [ 191] , [ 265] , [ 266] * [I] 4,9; | [A]KR20170122134 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2019505964 (ZHAMU ARUNA ET AL) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [XI]CN212182451U (NANJING DINGTENG GRAPHENE RES INSTITUTE CO LTD) [X] 1,10 * figures 1, 3, 4 * * paragraphs [0010] , [0 25] , [0 32] * [I] 8 | International search | [A]JP2010027368 (NEC TOKIN CORP) [A] 1-10* entire document *; | [A]CN101645519 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD JP) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [Y]CN101867060 (HONGFUJIN PREC IND SHENZHEN, et al) [Y] 1-10 * description, paragraphs 36-60 *; | [A]CN109037590 (AMPRIUS WUXI CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [Y]CN111525099 (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * description, paragraphs [0011]-[0057] *; | [PX]CN113437356 (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * claims 1-10 * |