EP4331391 - TOBACCO SHEET FOR NON-COMBUSTION HEATING TYPE FLAVOR INHALERS, NON-COMBUSTION HEATING TYPE FLAVOR INHALER, AND NON-COMBUSTION HEATING TYPE FLAVOR INHALATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | 27.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1, Toranomon 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6927 / JP | [2024/15] |
Former [2024/10] | For all designated states Japan Tobacco, Inc. 1-1, Toranomon 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-6927 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOIDE, Akihiro Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 02 /
UCHII, Kimitaka Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 03 /
MATSUDA, Takahiro Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 04 /
HASHIMOTO, Ayaka Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 05 /
YAMADA, Manabu Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 06 /
SHIBUICHI, Hiroshi Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 07 /
MOTODAMARI Tetsuya Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 08 /
SAKURAI, Toru Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 22795780.0 | 26.04.2022 | [2024/10] | WO2022JP18861 | Priority number, date | JP20210075206 | 27.04.2021 Original published format: JP 2021075206 | WO2021JP18192 | 13.05.2021 Original published format: PCT/JP2021/018192 | JP20210143801 | 03.09.2021 Original published format: JP 2021143801 | JP20210170066 | 18.10.2021 Original published format: JP 2021170066 | [2024/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022230867 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4331391 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24D1/20, A24D3/04, A24D3/17, A24F40/20, A24F40/40 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
A24D1/20 (EP,KR,US);
A24B3/14 (KR,US);
A24B15/12 (US);
A24B15/14 (EP,KR);
A24B15/16 (EP,KR);
A24B15/28 (KR);
A24B15/302 (EP);
A24B15/32 (KR);
A24D1/02 (US);
A24D1/045 (US);
A24D3/04 (EP,KR);
A24D3/062 (EP);
A24D3/064 (US);
A24D3/17 (KR,US);
A24F40/20 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Title | German: | TABAKFOLIE FÜR VERBRENNUNGSFREIE GESCHMACKSINHALATOREN, VERBRENNUNGSFREIER GESCHMACKSINHALATOR UND VERBRENNUNGSFREIES GESCHMACKSINHALATIONSSYSTEM | [2024/10] | English: | TOBACCO SHEET FOR NON-COMBUSTION HEATING TYPE FLAVOR INHALERS, NON-COMBUSTION HEATING TYPE FLAVOR INHALER, AND NON-COMBUSTION HEATING TYPE FLAVOR INHALATION SYSTEM | [2024/10] | French: | FEUILLE DE TABAC POUR INHALATEURS D'ARÔME DE TYPE À CHAUFFAGE SANS COMBUSTION, INHALATEUR D'ARÔME DE TYPE À CHAUFFAGE SANS COMBUSTION ET SYSTÈME D'INHALATION D'ARÔME DE TYPE À CHAUFFAGE SANS COMBUSTION | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2023 | Translation filed | 14.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2018512142 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO (INVESTMENTS) LTD.) [Y] 19-20* see in particular, paragraph [0079], fig. 1 *; | [Y]WO2020089071 (NERUDIA LTD [GB]) [Y] 15-16 * see in particular, p. 11, lines 5-7 *; | [Y]JP2020074714 (MIZUGUCHI KAKUSHI) [Y] 16 * see in particular, paragraph [0051] *; | [Y]CN111757679 (KT & G CORP) [Y] 17-18 * see in particular, paragraph [0084], fig. 5 *; | [Y]US2020359688 (JANG YONG JOON [KR], et al) [Y] 15 * see in particular, paragraphs [0031]-[0093], fig. 1-5 *; | [YX]JP2021507700 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS S.A.) [Y] 15-20 [X] 1-14, 21; | [YX]JP2021507684 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS S.A.) [Y] 15-20 [X] 1-14, 21 | by applicant | JPS6045914B | WO2013067511 | JP5969923B | JP2017218699 |