EP4331766 - HEAT SINK, AND HEAT SINK INTEGRATED-TYPE INSULATING CIRCUIT BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | 27.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHASHI, Toyo Saitama-shi, Saitama 330-8508 / JP | 02 /
KUROMITSU, Yoshiro Naka-shi, Ibaraki 311-0102 / JP | 03 /
IWAZAKI, Wataru Saitama-shi, Saitama 330-8508 / JP | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 22795790.9 | 26.04.2022 | [2024/10] | WO2022JP18886 | Priority number, date | JP20210074746 | 27.04.2021 Original published format: JP 2021074746 | [2024/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022230877 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4331766 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B23K20/00, H01L23/36, H05K7/20 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
H01L23/3735 (EP);
H01L21/4882 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Title | German: | KÜHLKÖRPER UND KÜHLKÖRPERINTEGRIERTE ISOLIERENDE LEITERPLATTE | [2024/10] | English: | HEAT SINK, AND HEAT SINK INTEGRATED-TYPE INSULATING CIRCUIT BOARD | [2024/10] | French: | DISSIPATEUR THERMIQUE, ET CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ D'ISOLATION DE TYPE INTÉGRÉ DE DISSIPATEUR THERMIQUE | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2023 | Translation filed | 08.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AY]JPH09298259 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [Y]JP2013089865 (SHOWA DENKO KK); | [Y]JP2019149459 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [Y]JP2019149460 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [Y]WO2020111107 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JPH11204700 | JP2004022914 | WO2011155379 | JP2014076486 | JP2021074746 |