EP4330870 - DATA DIVERSITY VISUALIZATION AND QUANTIFICATION FOR MACHINE LEARNING MODELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Precision Healthcare LLC 9900 W. Innovation Drive Milwaukee, WI 53226 / US | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANAND, Deepa Bangalore 560066 / IN | 02 /
MULLICK, Rakesh Bangalore 560066 / IN | 03 /
SHANBHAG, Dattesh Dayanand Bangalore 560066 / IN | 04 /
EDGAR, Marc T New York 12077 / US | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 22796451.7 | 22.04.2022 | [2024/10] | WO2022US25938 | Priority number, date | US202117243046 | 28.04.2021 Original published format: US202117243046 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022231970 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4330870 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06N20/00, G06F16/901, G06F16/904 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
G06N3/088 (EP);
G06N5/04 (US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N3/048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Title | German: | DATENDIVERSITÄTSVISUALISIERUNG UND -QUANTIFIZIERUNG FÜR MASCHINENLERNMODELLE | [2024/10] | English: | DATA DIVERSITY VISUALIZATION AND QUANTIFICATION FOR MACHINE LEARNING MODELS | [2024/10] | French: | VISUALISATION ET QUANTIFICATION DE DIVERSITÉ DE DONNÉES POUR MODÈLES D'APPRENTISSAGE AUTOMATIQUE | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US10679100 (KANG YIPING [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * claims 1-15 *; | [Y]CN111382807 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0127]; claims 1, 10-11, 18; and figures 6A-6C *; | [Y]US2020351283 (SALUNKE SAMPANNA SHAHAJI [US], et al) [Y] 5-6,12-13,19-20 * claim 2 *; | [Y]CN112306494 (UNIV NANJING AERONAUTICS & ASTRONAUTICS) [Y] 1-20 * claim 1 *; | [A]CN112489628 (PING AN TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [A] 1-20* claims 1-10 * |