EP4336596 - DISPERSANT FOR POWER STORAGE DEVICE POSITIVE ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2024/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITOI, Akito Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 02 /
KINOSHITA, Yutaro Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 03 /
SHIROTA, Kyoichi Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | [2024/11] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/11] | Application number, filing date | 22798931.6 | 28.04.2022 | [2024/11] | WO2022JP19385 | Priority number, date | JP20210078723 | 06.05.2021 Original published format: JP 2021078723 | [2024/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022234827 | Date: | 10.11.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4336596 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/62, C08F220/12, C08F220/44, C08F220/56, C08F226/06, C08K3/04, C08L33/08, C09K23/52, H01M4/13, H01M4/139 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
C09K23/52 (EP);
H01M4/62 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/1818 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/44 (EP,KR);
C08F220/48 (US);
C08F220/56 (KR);
C08F226/06 (KR);
C08K3/04 (KR);
C08L33/08 (EP,KR);
C08L33/22 (EP);
C08L33/26 (EP);
C09D5/24 (US);
C09D7/45 (US);
C09D7/61 (US);
C09D7/65 (US);
H01M4/13 (EP,KR);
H01M4/139 (EP,KR);
H01M4/622 (EP);
H01M4/625 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2800/20 (US);
C08K2201/001 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08F220/1818, C08F220/44, C08F220/56 (EP);
C08F220/1818, C08F226/06, C08F220/56 (EP);
C08F220/44, C08F220/1818, C08F220/56 (EP);
C08L33/08, C08K3/04 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] | Title | German: | DISPERGIERMITTEL FÜR POSITIVELEKTRODE EINER ENERGIESPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [2024/11] | English: | DISPERSANT FOR POWER STORAGE DEVICE POSITIVE ELECTRODE | [2024/11] | French: | DISPERSANT POUR ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE DE DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE | [2024/11] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2023 | Translation filed | 29.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/11] | 26.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2014203555 (TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO LTD); | [A]JP2018170218 (GS YUASA CORP, et al); | [A]WO2020208799 (KAO CORP [JP]); | [PX]JP2021163626 (KAO CORP) | by applicant | JP2014137916 | JP2018170218 | WO2020208880 |