EP4330458 - A NEW INDUSTRIAL WASHING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Realkom Tekstil Urunleri Sanayi Pazarlama Ve Dis Ticaret Anonim Sirketi Sakarya Mahallesi Turbe Caddesi No:4 34050 Eyup/Istanbul / TR | For all designated states Real Solutions Bilisim Teknolojileri Sanayi Ticaret Anonim Sirketi Orhangazi Mahallesi Teknopark Caddesi Teknopark Apt. No:1 Merkez 81620 Duzce / TR | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UNGOREN, Furkan Umraniye/Istanbul / TR | 02 /
ALPAGUT, Bisar Merkez Duzce / TR | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Demirkiran, Hasan Kordinat Inovasyon ve Fikri Mulkiyet Yonetimi Ltd. Sti. Nispetiye Mah. Nispetiye Cad. No:6 K:2 Etiler Besiktas 34340 Istanbul / TR | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 22799227.8 | 02.02.2022 | [2024/10] | WO2022TR50093 | Priority number, date | TR20210007455 | 01.05.2021 Original published format: TR 202107455 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022235231 | Date: | 10.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4330458 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | TR | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D06F33/00, D06F34/00 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
D06F34/05 (EP,US);
D06F31/00 (EP,US);
D06F33/30 (EP,US);
D06F34/28 (US);
G05B19/042 (US);
G05B19/05 (US);
D06F2103/00 (EP);
D06F2103/02 (EP,US);
D06F2105/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Title | German: | NEUES INDUSTRIELLES WASCHSYSTEM | [2024/10] | English: | A NEW INDUSTRIAL WASHING SYSTEM | [2024/10] | French: | NOUVEAU SYSTÈME DE LAVAGE INDUSTRIEL | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 31.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016090678 (RHODE RANDALL J [CA]); | [A]CN108070977 (NINGBO JIDE HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE TECH CO LTD); | [X]US2020385909 (XU SHENG [CN], et al); | [A]US2021062397 (CHA SEUNG CHUL [KR], et al) | by applicant | TR200800800 | CN101397736 | TR201101413 | CN102808303 | US10294600 | NO20210396 |