EP4404766 - METHOD FOR REDUCING THE BITTERNESS OF A LEGUMINOUS PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | 27.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 27.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROQUETTE FRERES 1 rue de la Haute Loge 62136 Lestrem / FR | [2024/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAROCHE, Christophe 35300 FOUGERES / FR | 02 /
LECOCQ, Aline 59420 MOUVAUX / FR | 03 /
FARDIN, Guillaume 59000 LILLE / FR | [2024/31] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/31] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 22801338.9 | 21.09.2022 | [2024/31] | WO2022EP25437 | Priority number, date | FR20210010088 | 24.09.2021 Original published format: FR 2110088 | [2024/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023046318 | Date: | 30.03.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4404766 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A23L11/30 | [2024/31] | CPC: |
A23L11/33 (EP);
A23L11/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DER BITTERKEIT EINES LEGUMINOSENPROTEINS | [2024/31] | English: | METHOD FOR REDUCING THE BITTERNESS OF A LEGUMINOUS PROTEIN | [2024/31] | French: | METHODE DE REDUCTION DE L'AMERTUME D'UNE PROTEINE DE LEGUMINEUSE | [2024/31] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/31] | 18.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0380343 (ALKO LTD [FI]); | [XI]WO9527406 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al); | [A]WO9528850 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al); | [A]WO0187083 (UNIV SASKATCHEWAN [CA], et al); | [XI]US7070953 (BJARNASON JON BRAGI [IS], et al); | [XI]US2007014909 (MAI JIMBIN [US], et al); | [XI]WO2010092778 (FUJI OIL CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2019096862 (AVRIL [FR], et al); | [XP]WO2021198167 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]) | by applicant | WO9527406 | EP1400537 | US7070953 | US2007014909 | WO2007006952 | WO2010092778 | WO2015071498 | WO2017129921 | US10143226 | WO2019048564 | WO2019048804 | WO2019053387 | WO2020240144 | WO2020260841 | WO2021100729 |