EP4239475 - TRANSACTION PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DATABASE SYSTEM, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE, COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518057 / CN | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Haixiang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/36] | Gunzelmann, Rainer, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22803726.3 | 20.04.2022 | [2023/36] | WO2022CN87848 | Priority number, date | CN202110546080 | 19.05.2021 Original published format: CN202110546080 | [2023/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022242401 | Date: | 24.11.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4239475 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.11.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46, G06F16/21, G06F16/00, G06F9/52 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
G06F9/466 (EP,US);
G06F9/467 (CN);
G06F16/00 (EP);
G06F16/21 (EP);
G06F16/2329 (US);
G06F16/2365 (US);
G06F9/4881 (CN);
G06F9/5038 (CN);
G06F2209/481 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | TRANSAKTIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN DATENBANKSYSTEM UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT | [2023/36] | English: | TRANSACTION PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DATABASE SYSTEM, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE, COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | [2023/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE TRANSACTION POUR SYSTÈME DE BASE DE DONNÉES, AINSI QUE DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR, ET PRODUIT PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR | [2023/36] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2023 | Translation filed | 01.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 12.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN109710388 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [Y] 3,4* paragraphs [0170] , [ 177] *; | [XYI]CN111708615 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [X] 1,2,8-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 76] - [0322]; figures 1, 9, 10 * [Y] 3,4 [I] 5-7; | US2022245133 [ ] (LI HAIXIANG [CN]) | International search | [A]US2017220617 (BORTNIKOV EDWARD [IL], et al) [A] 1-22* entire document *; | [A]CN111143389 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD , et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]CN111209093 (UNIV EAST CHINA NORMAL) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]CN111708615 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [A] 1-22 * description, paragraphs 0320-0377, and figures 9-10 *; | [A]CN111736964 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]CN112231071 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [A] 1-22 * entire document * |