EP4343443 - CARRIER CORE MATERIAL, AND CARRIER FOR ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC DEVELOPMENT AND ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC DEVELOPER EMPLOYING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOWA Electronics Materials Co., Ltd. 4-14-1, Sotokanda Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | For all designated states Dowa IP Creation Co., Ltd. 7 Chikko Sakae-Machi Minami-Ku Okayama-shi, Okayama 702-8053 / JP | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Shinya Okayama-shi, Okayama 702-8053 / JP | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2024/13] | Application number, filing date | 22804487.1 | 19.04.2022 | [2024/13] | WO2022JP18107 | Priority number, date | JP20210085066 | 20.05.2021 Original published format: JP 2021085066 | [2024/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022244573 | Date: | 24.11.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4343443 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/107 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
G03G9/1085 (EP);
G03G9/107 (EP);
G03G9/108 (EP);
G03G9/113 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRÄGERKERNMATERIAL UND TRÄGER FÜR ELEKTROFOTOGRAFISCHE ENTWICKLUNG UND ELEKTROFOTOGRAFISCHER ENTWICKLER DAMIT | [2024/13] | English: | CARRIER CORE MATERIAL, AND CARRIER FOR ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC DEVELOPMENT AND ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC DEVELOPER EMPLOYING SAME | [2024/13] | French: | MATÉRIAU DE NOYAU DE SUPPORT, ET SUPPORT POUR DÉVELOPPEMENT ÉLECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUE ET RÉVÉLATEUR ÉLECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUE LE METTANT EN OEUVRE | [2024/13] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2023 | Translation filed | 02.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2014033875 (DOWA ELECTRONICS MATERIALS CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-9* paragraphs [0035]-[0089] * | by applicant | JP2009086093 | JP2016170224 |