EP4340796 - WIRE ACTIVATED BRAKE SYSTEM FOR A WALKING AID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Topro Industri AS Postboks 428 2803 Gjøvik / NO | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MYHREN, Jan Hallvard 2607 Vingrom / NO | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | Zacco Norway AS P.O. Box 488 Skøyen 0213 Oslo / NO | [2024/13] | Application number, filing date | 22805055.5 | 18.05.2022 | [2024/13] | WO2022NO50112 | Priority number, date | NO20210000640 | 21.05.2021 Original published format: NO 20210640 | [2024/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022245223 | Date: | 24.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4340796 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XN | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61H3/04, B62B5/04, B60T7/10, A61G5/10, B62K23/06, F16D125/66, B62L3/02 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
B60T7/102 (EP);
A61H3/04 (EP,NO);
A61G5/101 (NO);
B60T1/04 (EP);
B60T7/104 (NO);
B62B5/0438 (NO);
F16D65/22 (NO);
A61H2003/046 (EP,NO);
A61H2201/1635 (EP);
F16D2125/66 (EP,NO)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTBETÄTIGTE BREMSANLAGE FÜR EINE GEHHILFE | [2024/13] | English: | WIRE ACTIVATED BRAKE SYSTEM FOR A WALKING AID | [2024/13] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FREIN ACTIVÉ PAR FIL POUR AIDE À LA MARCHE | [2024/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]GB2327724 (FONG HSIANG METAL INDUSTRY CO [TW], et al) [Y] 1,2, 4-7 * Whole document Whole document * [Y] 1, 2, 4-7 [A] 3, 8-17; | [Y]EP1092411 (TAKANO CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1, 2, 4-7 * Abstract; paragraph [0065], [0067]; fig. 3, 4, 12 *; | [A]US6899202 (MCINTYRE JOHN [US]) [A] 8-17* Whole document *; | [Y]US7866677 (ROTHSTEIN POLLY [US], et al) [Y] 1, 5, 7 * Col. 2, lines 45-63; fig. 1 *; | [A]CN209852345U (BEIJING WANTONG XINGYE KITCHEN EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [A] 8-17 * Abstract; 4th and 2nd last paragraphs in the machine translation of the description into English available in espacenet; fig. 5 * |