EP4340513 - SCHEDULING METHOD FOR SHARED CHANNEL, APPARATUS, TERMINAL, AND NETWORK SIDE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. No.1, Vivo Road Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENG, Chaojun Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 22806752.6 | 10.05.2022 | [2024/12] | WO2022CN92007 | Priority number, date | CN202110513636 | 11.05.2021 Original published format: CN202110513636 | [2024/12] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022237789 | Date: | 17.11.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4340513 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
H04W72/232 (EP,US);
H04L5/0057 (CN);
H04L1/0031 (EP);
H04L1/1819 (EP);
H04L1/1896 (EP);
H04L5/0016 (EP);
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0058 (EP);
H04L5/0064 (CN);
H04L5/0078 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Title | German: | PLANUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN GEMEINSAM GENUTZTEN KANAL, VORRICHTUNG, ENDGERÄT UND NETZWERKSEITIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2024/12] | English: | SCHEDULING METHOD FOR SHARED CHANNEL, APPARATUS, TERMINAL, AND NETWORK SIDE DEVICE | [2024/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PLANIFICATION POUR CANAL PARTAGÉ, APPAREIL, TERMINAL ET DISPOSITIF CÔTÉ RÉSEAU | [2024/12] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2023 | Translation filed | 30.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN111277388 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [X]WO2020223960 (BEIJING XIAOMI MOBILE SOFTWARE CO LTD [CN]); | [A]WO2021043010 (ZTE CORP [CN]) |