EP4322356 - VOLTAGE PROTECTION APPARATUS AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AN, Zheying Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
CAO, Wenfei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHAO, Zifeng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstraße 31 80801 München / DE | [2024/07] | Application number, filing date | 22806867.2 | 13.05.2022 | [2024/07] | WO2022CN92881 | Priority number, date | CN202110510999 | 11.05.2021 Original published format: CN202110510999 | [2024/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022237905 | Date: | 17.11.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4322356 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02H9/04 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
H02H9/042 (EP);
H02H9/044 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] | Title | German: | SPANNUNGSSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM | [2024/07] | English: | VOLTAGE PROTECTION APPARATUS AND SYSTEM | [2024/07] | French: | APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES SURTENSIONS | [2024/07] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2023 | Translation filed | 10.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003068926 (WING ALLAN J [US]) [A] 1-11* entire document *; | [Y]CN201663238U (HEBEI WEIAO ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-11 * description, paragraphs 21-25 and figures 1-4 *; | [A]CN102735362 (BEIJING TELEMETRY TECH INST, et al) [A] 1-11 * entire document *; | [Y]CN106922080 (SHANGHAI QIANSHITONG COMMUNICATION TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-11 * description, paragraphs 23-44 and figures 1-3 *; | [Y]CN110739673 (CYBERPOWER SYSTEMS INC) [Y] 1-11 * description, paragraphs 14-32 and figures 1-7 *; | [Y]CN112351579 (ANHUI YANSHI TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-11 * description, paragraphs 27-41 and figures 1-4 * |