EP4373726 - PERFORMANCE TESTING FOR MOBILE ROBOT TRAJECTORY PLANNERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Five AI Limited Kett House Station Road Cambridge CB1 2JH / GB | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITESIDE, Iain Bristol Bristol BS1 6QS / GB | 02 /
FERRI, Marco Bristol Bristol BS1 6QS / GB | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 22809875.2 | 02.11.2022 | [2024/22] | WO2022EP80564 | Priority number, date | GB20210015738 | 02.11.2021 Original published format: GB 202115738 | [2024/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023078938 | Date: | 11.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4373726 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60W60/00, G06F11/36, G06F11/34 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
G06F11/3664 (EP);
G06F11/3447 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSPRÜFUNG FÜR BAHNPLANER MOBILER ROBOTER | [2024/22] | English: | PERFORMANCE TESTING FOR MOBILE ROBOT TRAJECTORY PLANNERS | [2024/22] | French: | TESTS DE PERFORMANCE POUR PLANIFICATEURS DE TRAJECTOIRE DE ROBOT MOBILE | [2024/22] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/22] | 23.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2021037761 (FIVE AI LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 3, line 89 - page 4, line 3 * * page 5, line 133 - line 135 * * page 5, line 137 - line 139 * * page 7, line 205 - line 212 * * page 7, line 213 - line 219 * * page 12, line 335 - line 338 * * page 18, line 514 - line 516 * * page 24, line 683 - line 687 * * page 76, line 2129 - line 2132 * * page 81, line 2262 - line 2263 *; | [Y] - LONG PHILIP ET AL, "A Risk Informed Task Planning Framework for Humanoid Robots in Hazardous Environments", 2018 IEEE-RAS 18TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON HUMANOID ROBOTS (HUMANOIDS), IEEE, (20181106), doi:10.1109/HUMANOIDS.2018.8625061, pages 139 - 144, XP033505574 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 139, column right, line 5 - line 7 * * page 140, column left, line 46 - line 53 * * page 141, column left, line 39 - page 141, column right, line 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/HUMANOIDS.2018.8625061 | by applicant | WO2021037763 | WO2021037760 | WO2021037765 | WO2021037761 | WO2021037766 |