EP4349885 - THREE-DIMENSION CARBOXYLIC ACID COVALENT ORGANIC FRAMEWORK, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tsinghua University Qinghua Yuan Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | For all designated states Beijing Vfortune New Energy Power Technology Development Co., Ltd. CG05-277, Floor 1, Building 8 Courtyard 1, Zhongguancun East Road Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Hong Beijing 100084 / CN | 02 /
HE, Xiangming Beijing 100084 / CN | 03 /
LI, Zonglong Beijing 100084 / CN | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22810401.4 | 16.05.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022CN93033 | Priority number, date | CN202110592504 | 28.05.2021 Original published format: CN202110592504 | [2024/15] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022247674 | Date: | 01.12.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4349885 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.12.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C08G12/08, B01J20/30, B01J31/08, B01J20/22 | [2024/40] | CPC: |
B01J31/08 (EP);
C08G83/008 (CN);
B01J20/22 (EP);
B01J20/226 (CN);
B01J20/30 (EP);
B01J20/3085 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2024/15] | C08G83/00, B01J20/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | KOVALENTES ORGANISCHES GERÜST AUS DREIDIMENSIONALER CARBONSÄURE, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2024/15] | English: | THREE-DIMENSION CARBOXYLIC ACID COVALENT ORGANIC FRAMEWORK, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND USE THEREOF | [2024/15] | French: | STRUCTURE ORGANIQUE COVALENTE D'ACIDE CARBOXYLIQUE À TROIS DIMENSIONS, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET SON UTILISATION | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2023 | Translation filed | 21.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2017143348 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | [A]CN107915658 (DALIAN INST CHEM & PHYSICS CAS); | [A]KR20180074094 (POSCO [KR], et al); | [A]CN108503853 (UNIV WUHAN); | [A]CN111303442 (UNIV JILIN); | [A]CN111349249 (UNIV NANKAI); | [A]CN112250883 (UNIV WUHAN); | [A]CN112574370 (UNIV TAIZHOU) |