EP4350433 - CAMERA DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. 30, Magokjungang 10-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 07796 / KR | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Min Woo Seoul 07796 / KR | 02 /
HWANG, Sun Min Seoul 07796 / KR | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22811700.8 | 28.05.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022KR07618 | Priority number, date | KR20210069562 | 28.05.2021 Original published format: KR 20210069562 | [2024/15] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022250509 | Date: | 01.12.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4350433 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G03B17/56, H04N5/232, H04N5/225, F16M11/12 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
G03B17/561 (EP,KR);
B60R1/28 (US);
F16M11/12 (EP);
F16M11/126 (KR);
H04N23/54 (KR,US);
H04N23/55 (EP,US);
H04N23/57 (EP,US);
H04N23/661 (KR);
G03B30/00 (EP);
G03B37/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | KAMERAVORRICHTUNG | [2024/15] | English: | CAMERA DEVICE | [2024/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CAMÉRA | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2023 | Translation filed | 28.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR20110107536 (SEEEYES CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20160071031 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20160092819 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]KR20180053077 (ERAE AMS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20200036487 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) |