EP4350787 - LED LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI HIGH-TECH CORPORATION 17-1, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMIZU, Hayato Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
HORIKAWA, Hiroshi Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Takuya Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | 04 /
KAWAHARA, Tetsuji Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22815733.5 | 14.04.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022JP17769 | Priority number, date | JP20210093749 | 03.06.2021 Original published format: JP 2021093749 | [2024/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022254977 | Date: | 08.12.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4350787 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/64, G01N21/01 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
H01L33/64 (EP);
H01L33/648 (US);
G01N21/255 (EP);
H01L33/641 (US);
G01N2201/022 (EP);
G01N2201/0624 (EP);
G01N2201/1211 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | LED-LICHTQUELLENVORRICHTUNG | [2024/15] | English: | LED LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE | [2024/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SOURCE DE LUMIÈRE À DEL | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2023 | Translation filed | 24.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 27.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2009021384 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al); | [YAX]JP2009129709 (TOYODA GOSEI KK); | [AY]WO2010013777 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP [JP], et al); | [AY]JP2021081312 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP) |