EP4345087 - PRODUCT 1,3-BUTYLENE GLYCOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KH Neochem Co., Ltd. 2-3-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0022 / JP | [2024/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Hirotaka Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-0032 / JP | 02 /
HAKUMURA, Takashi Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-8502 / JP | 03 /
KANADA, Jun Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-8502 / JP | [2024/14] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2024/14] | Application number, filing date | 22816181.6 | 02.06.2022 | [2024/14] | WO2022JP22426 | Priority number, date | JP20210094284 | 04.06.2021 Original published format: JP 2021094284 | [2024/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022255436 | Date: | 08.12.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4345087 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07C31/20, C07C29/74 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
C07C29/86 (EP);
C07C31/207 (EP,KR,US);
C07C29/74 (US);
C07C29/76 (KR);
C07C31/20 (US);
B01D15/08 (US);
| C-Set: |
C07C29/86, C07C31/207 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/14] | Title | German: | PRODUKT VON 1,3-BUTYLENGLYKOL | [2024/14] | English: | PRODUCT 1,3-BUTYLENE GLYCOL | [2024/14] | French: | PRODUIT 1,3-BUTYLÈNE GLYCOL | [2024/14] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2023 | Translation filed | 28.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0821829 (DAICEL CHEM); | [A]WO0007969 (DAICEL CHEM [JP], et al); | [A]JP2001213828 (DAICEL CHEM); | [A]JP2001288131 (DAICEL CHEM); | [A]US8445733 (WINDHORST KENNETH A [US], et al); | [A]JP2020512351 ; | [A]JP2021038189 (DAICEL CORP); | [A]JP2021042214 (DAICEL CORP) | by applicant | JPH0380139B | JPH07258129 | JP2003096006 | JP4559625B | JP2021094284 |