EP4207461 - BATTERY PACK AND AUTOMOBILE INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Tae-Kyeong Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
WOO, Sung-Hoon Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Tae-Geun Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
AN, Hyuk Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/27] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 22816446.3 | 31.05.2022 | [2023/27] | WO2022KR07774 | Priority number, date | KR20210071805 | 02.06.2021 Original published format: KR 20210071805 | [2023/27] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022255787 | Date: | 08.12.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4207461 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/342, H01M50/249 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
H01M50/249 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/3425 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/204 (EP);
H01M50/209 (EP,US);
H01M50/258 (US);
H01M50/358 (US);
H01M50/367 (EP);
H01M2200/20 (EP,KR);
H01M2220/20 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | BATTERIEPACK UND AUTOMOBIL DAMIT | [2023/27] | English: | BATTERY PACK AND AUTOMOBILE INCLUDING SAME | [2023/27] | French: | BLOC-BATTERIE ET AUTOMOBILE COMPORTANT CELUI-CI | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2023 | Translation filed | 27.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2013120690 (DENSO CORP); | [Y]KR20160112768 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20180024861 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20200139202 (BYD CO LTD [CN]); | [A]JP2021013571 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) | by applicant | KR20210071805 |