EP4353815 - METHOD FOR ISOLATING EXTRACELLULAR VESICLE USING SALT FRACTIONAL PRECIPITATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institute for Basic Science 55, Expo-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34126 / KR | For all designated states Ulsan National Institute of Science and Technology (UNIST) 50, UNIST-gil Eonyang-eup Ulju-gun Ulsan 44919 / KR | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Yoon-Kyoung Ulju-gun, Ulsan 44920 / KR | 02 /
SUNKARA, Vijaya Ulju-gun, Ulsan 44919 / KR | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 22816499.2 | 03.06.2022 | [2024/16] | WO2022KR07932 | Priority number, date | KR20210072868 | 04.06.2021 Original published format: KR 20210072868 | [2024/16] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022255840 | Date: | 08.12.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4353815 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00, C12N5/078, C12N5/071, B01D21/00, B01D35/02, B01D15/38, B01D61/14 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
C12N5/0018 (EP);
C12Q1/24 (KR);
G01N1/34 (US);
B01D15/3809 (US);
B01D15/3828 (US);
B01D21/00 (KR);
B01D21/01 (US);
B01D21/262 (US);
C12N15/101 (US);
C12N5/00 (KR);
C12N5/0693 (US);
B01D15/38 (EP);
C12N2500/05 (EP);
C12N2509/00 (KR);
C12N2509/10 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ISOLIERUNG VON EXTRAZELLULÄREN VESIKELN MITTELS FRAKTIONIERTER AUSFÄLLUNG | [2024/16] | English: | METHOD FOR ISOLATING EXTRACELLULAR VESICLE USING SALT FRACTIONAL PRECIPITATION | [2024/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ISOLEMENT DE VÉSICULE EXTRACELLULAIRE À L'AIDE D'UNE PRÉCIPITATION FRACTIONNÉE DE SEL | [2024/16] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2023 | Translation filed | 15.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2017141947 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]); | [DX]US9835626 (SCHROIT ALAN J [US], et al); | [A]KR20190012022 (ROSETTA EXOSOME [KR], et al); | [X]CN109355258 (BEIJING ECHO BIOTECH CO LTD); | [X]KR102215237B (GFC LIFE SCIENCE CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | US9005888 | US9671321 | US9829483 | US9835626 | US2019078078 | US2020179827 |