EP4355038 - CIRCUIT BOARD AND SEMICONDUCTOR PACKAGE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | 15.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. 30, Magokjungang 10-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 07796 / KR | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAE, Jae Man Seoul 07796 / KR | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/16] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 22820589.4 | 10.06.2022 | [2024/16] | WO2022KR08175 | Priority number, date | KR20210075601 | 10.06.2021 Original published format: KR 20210075601 | KR20210097002 | 23.07.2021 Original published format: KR 20210097002 | [2024/16] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022260462 | Date: | 15.12.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4355038 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/11, H05K1/02, H05K1/03, H01L25/16, H01L23/48, H01L23/485, H01L23/28 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
H01L24/16 (EP,US);
H01L23/49827 (US);
H01L21/4857 (US);
H01L21/486 (US);
H01L23/48 (EP);
H01L23/49822 (US);
H05K1/113 (EP);
H05K3/429 (EP);
H01L2224/16227 (EP,US);
H01L23/3128 (EP);
H01L2924/1432 (US);
H01L2924/14335 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Title | German: | LEITERPLATTE UND HALBLEITERGEHÄUSE DAMIT | [2024/16] | English: | CIRCUIT BOARD AND SEMICONDUCTOR PACKAGE COMPRISING SAME | [2024/16] | French: | CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ ET BOÎTIER À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS LA COMPRENANT | [2024/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2023 | Translation filed | 12.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR20140030918 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]); | [X]JP2014131029 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH); | [A]US2014321084 (LEE SEUNG EUN [KR], et al); | [A]KR101472638B ; | [A]KR20190012873 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) |