EP4351161 - OPTICAL SIGNAL RECEIVING APPARATUS, METHOD AND SYSTEM, OPTICAL LINE TERMINAL, COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Bo Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Despag-Straße 6 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22824276.4 | 16.06.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022CN99116 | Priority number, date | CN202110677407 | 18.06.2021 Original published format: CN202110677407 | [2024/15] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022262803 | Date: | 22.12.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4351161 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP4351161 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.12.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00, H04B10/69, H04B10/67, H04B10/60 | [2024/40] | CPC: |
H04B10/69 (EP,CN);
H04Q11/0067 (CN,US);
H04B10/675 (US);
H04B10/60 (EP);
H04B10/67 (EP);
H04B10/6972 (US)
|
Former IPC [2024/15] | H04Q11/00, H04B10/69 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM EMPFANGEN OPTISCHER SIGNALE, OPTISCHES LEITUNGSENDGERÄT, COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2024/15] | English: | OPTICAL SIGNAL RECEIVING APPARATUS, METHOD AND SYSTEM, OPTICAL LINE TERMINAL, COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2024/15] | French: | APPAREIL, PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE RÉCEPTION DE SIGNAL OPTIQUE, TERMINAL DE LIGNE OPTIQUE ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2024 | Translation filed | 03.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]CN101536370 (KOREA ADVANCED INST SCI & TECH [KR]); | [A]KR20110064352 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]); | [A]CN105223663 (ACCELINK TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD); | [Y]US2017288782 (STISCIA JAMES J [US], et al) |