EP4195310 - POSITIVE ELECTRODE FOR LITHIUM-SULFUR BATTERY AND LITHIUM-SULFUR BATTERY COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Da Young Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Changhoon Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 22825160.9 | 19.05.2022 | [2023/24] | WO2022KR07156 | Priority number, date | KR20210077210 | 15.06.2021 Original published format: KR 20210077210 | [2023/24] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022265234 | Date: | 22.12.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4195310 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/13, H01M4/36, H01M4/38, H01M4/62, H01M10/052, H01M4/02 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
H01M4/13 (EP,KR);
H01M4/583 (US);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/02 (EP);
H01M4/136 (EP,US);
H01M4/1397 (EP);
H01M4/36 (EP);
H01M4/364 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/366 (EP);
H01M4/38 (EP,KR);
H01M4/382 (EP);
H01M4/5815 (EP);
H01M4/587 (EP);
H01M4/62 (EP);
H01M4/625 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | POSITIVELEKTRODE FÜR LITHIUM-SCHWEFEL-BATTERIE UND LITHIUM-SCHWEFEL-BATTERIE DAMIT | [2023/24] | English: | POSITIVE ELECTRODE FOR LITHIUM-SULFUR BATTERY AND LITHIUM-SULFUR BATTERY COMPRISING SAME | [2023/24] | French: | ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE POUR UNE BATTERIE AU LITHIUM-SOUFRE ET BATTERIE AU LITHIUM-SOUFRE LA COMPRENANT | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2023 | Translation filed | 07.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR20050010134 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * See entire document. *; | [A]KR20150142832 (ORANGE POWER LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * See entire document. *; | [A]CN109713282 (ZHUHAI COSLIGHT BATTERY CO LTD) [A] 1-14* See entire document. *; | [Y]KR20190068066 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-14 * See abstract; and claims 1, 3 and 4. *; | [Y]KR20200132248 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-14 * See abstract; paragraphs [0027], [0047], [0100], [0138], [0141] and [0148]; and claims 1-2, 4, 6, 8 and 10-11. 13 * | by applicant | KR20160037084 | KR20210077210 |