EP4261943 - CATHODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, AND CATHODE COMPOSITE MATERIAL, CATHODE, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Gi-Beom Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jong-Woo Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
LHO, Eun-Sol Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Kang-Joon Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
KWAK, Min Daejeon 34122 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Seul-Ki Daejeon 34122 / KR | 07 /
KIM, Hyeong-Il Daejeon 34122 / KR | 08 /
PARK, Sang-Min Daejeon 34122 / KR | 09 /
LEE, Sang-Wook Daejeon 34122 / KR | 10 /
JUNG, Wang-Mo Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 22825221.9 | 09.06.2022 | [2023/42] | WO2022KR08161 | Priority number, date | KR20210079001 | 17.06.2021 Original published format: KR 20210079001 | [2023/42] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022265296 | Date: | 22.12.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4261943 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/36, H01M4/525, H01M4/505, H01M4/131, H01M10/052 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
H01M4/131 (EP,KR);
H01M4/364 (EP,KR);
H01M4/525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/366 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/505 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/625 (US);
H01M2004/021 (US);
H01M2004/028 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Title | German: | KATHODENAKTIVMATERIAL FÜR LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND KATHODENVERBUNDSTOFF, KATHODE UND LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE DAMIT | [2023/42] | English: | CATHODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, AND CATHODE COMPOSITE MATERIAL, CATHODE, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING SAME | [2023/42] | French: | MATÉRIAU ACTIF DE CATHODE POUR UNE BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM, ET MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE DE CATHODE, CATHODE ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM LE COMPRENANT | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2023 | Translation filed | 11.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR101109068B (HITACHI VEHICLE ENERGY, LTD.) [A] 1-12* See entire document. *; | [A]JP2013246936 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-12 * See entire document. *; | [A]KR20190059249 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 8 * See claim 1. *; | [Y]WO2019187538 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * See claims 1 and 4-5; and paragraphs [0020], [0027] and [0058]-[0062]. *; | [Y]KR20200001230 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-12 * See claims 1 and 6. * | by applicant | KR20210079001 |