EP4355336 - PRODRUGS OF DEOXYNUCLEOSIDES FOR TREATMENT OF MITOCHONDRIAL DISEASES CAUSED BY UNBALANCED NUCLEOTIDE POOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zogenix, Inc. 5959 Horton Street, Suite 500 Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIPIETRO, Daniel New York, NY 10019 / US | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 22825758.0 | 15.06.2022 | [2024/17] | WO2022US33654 | Priority number, date | US202163212468P | 18.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163212468 P | [2024/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022266237 | Date: | 22.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4355336 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7068, A61K31/708, C07H19/173, A61P21/00 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
A61P43/00 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/708 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/7068 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/0053 (EP,IL,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Title | German: | PRODRUGS VON DEOXYNUKLEOSIDEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DURCH UNAUSGEGLICHENE NUKLEOTIDPOOLS VERURSACHTEN MITOCHONDRIALEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2024/17] | English: | PRODRUGS OF DEOXYNUCLEOSIDES FOR TREATMENT OF MITOCHONDRIAL DISEASES CAUSED BY UNBALANCED NUCLEOTIDE POOLS | [2024/17] | French: | PROMÉDICAMENTS DE DÉSOXYNUCLÉOSIDES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES MITOCHONDRIALES PROVOQUÉES PAR DES GROUPES DE NUCLÉOTIDES NON ÉQUILIBRÉS | [2024/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016279159 (HIRANO MICHIO [US], et al); | [A]WO2016205671 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al); | [X]WO2017087517 (DEMETER THERAPEUTICS LLC [US]); | [A]WO2019200340 (MODIS THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) |