EP4353096 - AEROSOL GENERATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Merit Technology Co., Ltd. 29-6-7, No. 29, Dongfang Avenue Dongfang Community, Songgang Street Baoan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518105 / CN | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUAN, Yongbao Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner, Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstraße 79 81541 München / DE | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 22827347.0 | 01.06.2022 | [2024/16] | WO2022CN96669 | Priority number, date | CN202110705941 | 24.06.2021 Original published format: CN202110705941 | [2024/16] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022267850 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4353096 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/40, A24F40/46 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
A24F40/40 (EP,CN,KR);
A24F40/485 (EP,KR);
A24F40/10 (EP);
A24F40/20 (EP);
A24F40/46 (EP,CN,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2024/16] | English: | AEROSOL GENERATING DEVICE | [2024/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL | [2024/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2024 | Translation filed | 09.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP3232841 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]); | [A]CN208676375U (VAPETALK ELECTRONIC TECH SHENZHEN COMPANY LIMITED); | [X]CN111420621 (SHENZHEN MAISHI TECH CO LTD); | [A]US2020359681 (HAN JUNG HO [KR], et al); | [X]CN111972712 (SHENZHEN MAISHI TECH CO LTD); | [X]CN212345294U (SHENZHEN MAISHI TECH CO LTD); | [PX]CN113508926 (SHENZHEN MAISHI TECH CO LTD); | [PX]CN215873451U (SHENZHEN MAISHI TECH CO LTD) |