EP4359677 - PRESSURE REGULATOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland, 2013 / NZ | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMS, David John Auckland, 2013 / NZ | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 22827790.1 | 21.06.2022 | [2024/18] | WO2022IB55731 | Priority number, date | US202163202689P | 21.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163202689 P | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022269478 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4359677 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 29.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16B2/22, F16L37/133, F16L3/123, A61M16/00, A61M16/06, A61M16/08, F16B17/00, F16B9/00 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
A61M16/0816 (EP);
A61M16/0003 (AU);
A61M16/06 (EP,AU);
A61M16/0875 (EP,AU);
A61M16/201 (EP);
F16B2/22 (AU);
F16L3/123 (AU);
F16L37/133 (AU);
A61M16/0066 (EP);
A61M16/0833 (EP);
A61M16/109 (EP);
A61M16/16 (EP);
A61M2016/0027 (AU);
A61M2205/276 (EP);
A61M2205/3348 (EP,AU);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Title | German: | DRUCKREGLERVORRICHTUNG | [2024/18] | English: | PRESSURE REGULATOR DEVICE | [2024/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉGULATION DE PRESSION | [2024/18] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 04.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE2648384 (GAMBRO AG); | [XY]US6805120 (JEFFREY CRAIG ROBERT [NZ], et al); | [A]US2008169646 (WERTH ALBERT [US]); | [A]US2008284163 (PROULX STEPHEN P [US], et al); | [A]US2009056719 (NEWMAN JR LIONEL [US]); | [Y]US2012301952 (ANDERSON LISA MARIA [US], et al); | [XY]US2014166013 (STENZLER ALEX [US], et al); | [A]US2018153771 (LEWKONYA GAD [IL], et al) |