EP4359445 - ISOLATED BISPECIFIC ANTIBODY THAT SPECIFICALLY BINDS TO CD47 AND PD-L1 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Joint Stock Company "Biocad" vn. ter. g. poselok Strelna ul. Svyazi, d. 38, str. 1, pomeshch. 89 Saint Petersburg 198515 / RU | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MISORIN, Alexey Konstantinovich Saint Petersburg, 194358 / RU | 02 /
SABIROV, Artur Khamidovich Kazan, 420140 / RU | 03 /
AZARIAN, Aleksandra Dmitrievna g. Volgograd, 400015 / RU | 04 /
VODOPYANOVA, Tatyana Andreevna g. Nizhnekamsk, 423570 / RU | 05 /
LEGOTSKY, Sergey Aleksandrovich Moscow, 111675 / RU | 06 /
GORDEEV, Aleksandr Andreevich Moscow, 117405 / RU | 07 /
DORONIN, Aleksandr Nikolaevich Moscow, 117535 / RU | 08 /
SOLOVYEV, Valery Vladimirovich g.Pushchino, 142290 / RU | 09 /
MOROZOV, Dmitry Valentinovich Saint Petersburg, 190000 / RU | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/18] | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22828864.3 | 21.06.2022 | [2024/18] | WO2022RU50195 | Priority number, date | RU20210118025 | 21.06.2021 Original published format: RU 2021118025 | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022271053 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4359445 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 29.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/30, C12N15/63, C12N15/13, A61K39/395, A61P35/00 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/2803 (EP);
C07K16/2827 (EP);
C07K2317/31 (EP);
C07K2317/76 (EP);
C07K2317/92 (EP);
C07K2317/94 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Title | German: | ISOLIERTER BISPEZIFISCHER ANTIKÖRPER MIT SPEZIFISCHER BINDUNG AN CD47 UND PD-L1 | [2024/18] | English: | ISOLATED BISPECIFIC ANTIBODY THAT SPECIFICALLY BINDS TO CD47 AND PD-L1 | [2024/18] | French: | ANTICORPS BISPÉCIFIQUE ISOLÉ SE LIANT DE MANI7RE SPÉCIFIQUE À CD47 ET PD-L1 | [2024/18] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 30.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]RU2532027 (MIKA FARMA GEZEL SHAFT FJUR DI EHNTVIKLJUNG UND FERMARKTUNG FARMATSOJTISHER PRODUKTE MBKH [DE]); | [YA]WO2019068302 (BIOCAD JOINT STOCK CO [RU]); | [Y]KR20190140979 (BIOCAD JOINT STOCK CO [RU]); |