EP4359157 - SAW SLIDE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Davis Young LLC 810 Sharon Drive Westlake, OH 44145 / US | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNG, Douglas Port Clinton, OH 43452 / US | 02 /
DAVIS, William H. Fairview Park, OH 44126 / US | 03 /
PISKURA, Robert North Ridgeville, OH 44039 / US | 04 /
ZAHN, Jeffrey N. Mentor, OH 44060 / US | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 22829141.5 | 21.06.2022 | [2024/18] | WO2022US34315 | Priority number, date | US202163212887P | 21.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163212887 P | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022271680 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4359157 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B23D47/02, B23D45/02, B27B5/18, B26D1/18, B23Q1/28, B27B5/29 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
B23D45/021 (EP);
B23D47/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Title | German: | SÄGESCHLITTENVORRICHTUNG | [2024/18] | English: | SAW SLIDE DEVICE | [2024/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHARIOT DE SCIE | [2024/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 30.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4964449 (CONNERS JOHN M [US]) [A] 1-12* , entire document *; | [Y]US5875828 (QUIRAM RONALD [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * , entire document, especially Figs 1, 7-8; col 2 In 26-30, 34-37, 60-65, col 4 In 31-35, 38-50, 56-60 *; | [A]US2010186567 (WIEZOREK STEVEN R [US]) [A] 1-12 * , entire document *; | [Y]US2012017737 (LIU JIE [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * , entire document, especially Figs 1-4, 15-23; para [0040], [0047], [0068]-[0069] *; | [Y]US2021046596 (DICK SPENCER B [US], et al) [Y] 2, 8 * , entire document, especially Figs 5, 34; para [0089]-[0090], [0093], [0115]-[0016] *; | [AP]US11040406 (YOUNG DOUGLAS [US], et al) [AP] 1-12 * , entire document * |