EP4358964 - ERK1/2 AND KRAS G12C INHIBITORS COMBINATION THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erasca, Inc. 3115 Merryfield Row, Suite 300 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHOEMAKER, Robert Field San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
LEW, Erin Denise San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
LIN, Wei San Diego, California 92121 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Jingchuan San Diego, California 92121 / US | 05 /
OH, Joanne San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Evans, Sophie Elizabeth, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 22829293.4 | 23.06.2022 | [2024/18] | WO2022US34684 | Priority number, date | US202163214767P | 24.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163214767 P | US202163277548P | 09.11.2021 Original published format: US 202163277548 P | US202163283034P | 24.11.2021 Original published format: US 202163283034 P | US202263321609P | 18.03.2022 Original published format: US 202263321609 P | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022271923 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4358964 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 29.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/506, A61K31/519, A61P35/00 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,AU,KR,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,AU,KR,US);
A61K31/497 (KR);
A61K31/519 (EP,AU,KR,US);
A61K39/39558 (KR);
A61K45/06 (KR,US);
C07K16/2863 (KR);
A61K2039/505 (KR);
A61K2039/545 (KR);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/506, A61K2300/00 (AU,EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (AU,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Title | German: | ERK1/2- UND KRAS-G12C-HEMMERKOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE | [2024/18] | English: | ERK1/2 AND KRAS G12C INHIBITORS COMBINATION THERAPY | [2024/18] | French: | POLYTHÉRAPIE REPOSANT SUR DES INHIBITEURS D'ERK1/2 ET DE KRAS G12C | [2024/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 25.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2016362406 (VENKATESAN ARANAPAKAM M [US], et al); | [Y]WO2018146316 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE]); | [Y]WO2021086726 (ASAN BIOSCIENCES LLC [US]); |