EP4363175 - CONTAINERIZED PLUG-IN SYSTEM FOR ROBOTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kinova Inc. 4333 Boulevard de la Grande-Allée Boisbriand, Québec J7H 1M7 / CA | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGERON, Mathieux Québec J0N 1M0 / CA | 02 /
VANNOBEL, Alexandre Montréal, Québec H2S 2R9 / CA | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/19] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 22831099.1 | 29.06.2022 | [2024/19] | WO2022CA51034 | Priority number, date | US202163216115P | 29.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163216115 P | [2024/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023272385 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4363175 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/18 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
B25J9/1656 (EP);
B25J9/1661 (US);
B25J9/06 (US);
G06F9/54 (EP);
G06F9/5077 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Title | German: | CONTAINERISIERTES STECKSYSTEM FÜR ROBOTER | [2024/19] | English: | CONTAINERIZED PLUG-IN SYSTEM FOR ROBOTICS | [2024/19] | French: | SYSTÈME ENFICHABLE CONTENEURISÉ DESTINÉ À LA ROBOTIQUE | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007191969 (SHI JIANYING [US], et al); | [A]WO2019146763 (INTEC INC [JP]); | [A]EP3644206 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) |